Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 03/14/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 03/14/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/14/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/16/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/05/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/05/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/05/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/05/2006
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/05/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/05/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/05/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/05/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/27/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/27/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/03/2006
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/09/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/09/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/18/2006