Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/14/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/14/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 03/14/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/14/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/14/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/15/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/15/2006
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/15/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/15/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/15/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/15/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/15/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/15/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/15/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/15/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/15/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/15/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/15/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/15/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/15/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/15/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/15/2006
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/16/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/16/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/16/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/16/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/16/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/16/2006
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/16/2006
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/16/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/28/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 03/28/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/28/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/28/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/28/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/28/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/28/2006
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/28/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/28/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/28/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/28/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/28/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 03/28/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/28/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/28/2006
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/28/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/29/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/29/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/29/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/29/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/29/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/29/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/29/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/29/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/29/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/29/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/29/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/29/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/29/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/29/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/29/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/29/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/29/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/30/2006
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/30/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/30/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/30/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/30/2006
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 03/30/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/04/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/04/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/04/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/04/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/04/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/04/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/04/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/04/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/04/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/04/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/04/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/04/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/04/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/04/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/04/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/05/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/05/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/05/2006
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 04/05/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/05/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/25/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/25/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/25/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/25/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/25/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/25/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/25/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/25/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/03/2006
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/03/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/03/2006
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/04/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/04/2006
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 05/10/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/23/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/06/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/06/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/06/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/12/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/27/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 09/06/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/20/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 09/27/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/09/2006