Refine your search

12 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
10/13/2006 Became Public Law No: 109-347.
10/13/2006 Signed by President.
10/03/2006 Presented to President.
09/30/2006 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR 9/29/2006 S10810-10817)
09/30/2006 Conference report agreed to in House: On agreeing to the conference report Agreed to by recorded vote: 409 - 2 (Roll no. 516).
09/29/2006 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 109-711 filed.(text of conference report: CR H8540-8569)
09/19/2006 To conference: Senate insisted on its amendment, requested a conference.(consideration: CR S9734)
09/14/2006 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 98 - 0. Record Vote Number: 249.(text: CR 9/20/2006 S9820-9847)
05/04/2006 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 421 - 2 (Roll no. 127).
05/01/2006 Committee on Transportation discharged.
04/28/2006 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on 109-447, Part I.
03/14/2006 Introduced in House