Committees: H.R.4954 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security03/14/2006 Referred to
04/28/2006 Reported by H. Rept. 109-447
04/04/2006 Hearings by
04/26/2006 Markup by
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Economic Security, Infrastructure Protection, and Cybersecurity03/15/2006 Referred to
03/30/2006 Reported by
03/30/2006 Markup by
03/16/2006 Hearings by
House Transportation and Infrastructure04/28/2006 Referred to
05/01/2006 Discharged from