There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the mandatory revocation of passports of individuals who are more than $5,000 in arrears in child support payments.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/14/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/14/2006Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on International Relations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/14/2006Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on International Relations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/14/2006Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on International Relations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/14/2006Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 03/14/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 03/16/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/16/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/16/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/16/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/16/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/16/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/16/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/29/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/29/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 03/30/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/06/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/27/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/14/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/14/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/26/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/26/2006
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/26/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/26/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/27/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/27/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/27/2006
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/27/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/27/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/27/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/27/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/28/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/20/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/25/2006

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/14/2006 Referred to
House International Relations03/14/2006 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4956. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/14/2006)

Amends title IV part D (Child Support and Establishment of Paternity) of the Social Security Act to provide for the mandatory revocation of passports of individuals who are more than $5,000 in arrears in child support payments.