Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/14/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 03/14/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 03/16/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/16/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/16/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/16/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/16/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/16/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/16/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/29/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/29/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 03/30/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/06/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/27/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/14/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/14/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/26/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/26/2006
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/26/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/26/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/27/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/27/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/27/2006
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/27/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/27/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/27/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/27/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/28/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/20/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/25/2006