Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/15/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 03/15/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/15/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 03/15/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 03/15/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/15/2006
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/15/2006
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/15/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/15/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/15/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/15/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/15/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/15/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/15/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/15/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/15/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/29/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/29/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/25/2006
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/25/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/25/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/03/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/03/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/03/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/03/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/03/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/03/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/03/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/04/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/04/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/12/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/12/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/12/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew