Committees: H.R.4975 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/16/2006 Referred to
04/04/2006 Hearings by
04/05/2006 Markup by
04/25/2006 Reported by House Report 109-439,Part 1
House Administration03/16/2006 Referred to
04/06/2006 Markup by
04/25/2006 Reported by House Report 109-439,Part 2
House Rules03/16/2006 Referred to
03/30/2006 Hearings by
04/05/2006 Markup by
04/25/2006 Reported by House Report 109-439,Part 3
House Government Reform03/16/2006 Referred to
04/06/2006 Markup by
04/25/2006 Reported by House Report 109-439,Part 4
House Standards of Official Conduct03/16/2006 Referred to
04/25/2006 Discharged from