There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Popular Titles

Electronic Surveillance bill (Identified by CRS)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

NSA Oversight Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To reiterate that chapters 119 and 121 of title 18, United States Code, and the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act of 1978 are the exclusive means by which domestic electronic surveillance may be conducted, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/16/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date All Actions
09/06/2006Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security
09/01/2006Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
06/20/2006Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4276, H4278)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/26/2006Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1809-1810)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/16/2006Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/16/2006Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/16/2006Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/16/2006Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (14)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/16/2006 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security09/01/2006 Referred to
09/06/2006 Hearings by
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)03/16/2006 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4976.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4976. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/16/2006)

NSA Oversight Act - States that provisions of the federal criminal code concerning wire and electronic communications and their interception and the Foreign Intelligence Surveillance Act of 1978 are the exclusive means by which domestic electronic surveillance may be conducted until specific statutory authorization for any other such surveillance is enacted.

Requires the President to report to the congressional intelligence and judiciary committees identifying U.S. persons who have been the subject of electronic surveillance not conducted under the above requirements, as well as the basis for the selection of such persons for such surveillance.