Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/28/2006
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/06/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/06/2006
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 04/27/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/27/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/02/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/02/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 06/16/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 06/16/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/22/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/22/2006
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/29/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/29/2006