Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/16/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/29/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 04/05/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/05/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/26/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/26/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/26/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/26/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/03/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/25/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/25/2006