Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/04/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/04/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/04/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/04/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/04/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/04/2006
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/04/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/18/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/18/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/22/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/24/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/07/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/07/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/10/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/27/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/27/2006