Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 03/16/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/16/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/16/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/25/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/25/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/25/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 05/04/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/04/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 05/24/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/13/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/19/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/20/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/12/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/12/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/28/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/28/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/06/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/06/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/06/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/12/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/20/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/25/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/25/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 09/28/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/29/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/14/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/14/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 11/14/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 12/07/2006