Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/24/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/15/2006
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/20/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/10/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/10/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/06/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 09/28/2006