Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/05/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/07/2006
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/21/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/10/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/19/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/20/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/24/2006