Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/05/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/05/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/06/2006
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/16/2006
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/17/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/19/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 06/06/2006
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/07/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/08/2006
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/14/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/29/2006