Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/05/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/05/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 04/25/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/03/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/03/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/08/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/12/2006
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/16/2006