Refine your search

Refined by:

Louisiana Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/03/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/09/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/16/2006
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/29/2006