Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/06/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/17/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/09/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/12/2006