Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 04/26/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/17/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/12/2006
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/16/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/29/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/10/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/24/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/25/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/25/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/25/2006