Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/05/2006
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/05/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/05/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/05/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/05/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/05/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/05/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/26/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/26/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/27/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/11/2006