Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/04/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/18/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/18/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/19/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/23/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/23/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/23/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/25/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/13/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/28/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/12/2006