Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/29/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/29/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 05/11/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/19/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/12/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew