There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Stop Tuberculosis (TB) Now Act of 2006

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to provide increased assistance for the prevention, treatment, and control of tuberculosis, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/28/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
04/19/2006Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman .
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/28/2006Referred to the Committee on International Relations, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/28/2006Referred to the Committee on International Relations, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/28/2006Referred to the Committee on International Relations, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/28/2006Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (85)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/28/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/28/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/28/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/28/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/04/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/04/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/04/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/04/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/04/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/04/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/27/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/27/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/27/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/27/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/02/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/02/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/09/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/17/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/17/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/23/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/23/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/23/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/06/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/06/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/06/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/14/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/21/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/21/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/11/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/11/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/11/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/11/2006
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/12/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/12/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 07/12/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/12/2006
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/12/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/12/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/12/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/12/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/12/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/12/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/18/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/18/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/18/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/18/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/18/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/18/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/18/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/20/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/20/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/26/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/26/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/26/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/27/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/27/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/27/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 07/28/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/12/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/12/2006
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 09/12/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/12/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/12/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/12/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/12/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/21/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/29/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/29/2006
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/13/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/13/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/07/2006

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations03/28/2006 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce03/28/2006 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health04/19/2006 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5022. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/28/2006)

Stop Tuberculosis (TB) Now Act of 2006 - Amends the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to require (currently, authorizes) the President to furnish assistance for tuberculosis (TB) prevention, treatment, and elimination.

Gives priority to activities described in the Stop TB Strategy (as defined by this Act). Revises related fund use provisions.

Authorizes the President, through the United States Agency for International Development (USAID), to provide increased resources to the World Health Organization (WHO) and the Stop Tuberculosis Partnership to improve the capacity of countries with high TB rates and other affected countries to implement the Stop TB Strategy.

Authorizes appropriations for Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDCP) TB activities.