Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/05/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/05/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/26/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/02/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/02/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/02/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/02/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/04/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/10/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/11/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/11/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/20/2006