Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/29/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/29/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 03/30/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/30/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/30/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/30/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/30/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/30/2006
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/30/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/30/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/30/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/05/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/05/2006
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/05/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/05/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/05/2006
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/05/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/05/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/05/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/05/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/05/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/05/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/05/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/05/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/05/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/05/2006
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/05/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/05/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/05/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/06/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/06/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/06/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/06/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/06/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/06/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/06/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/06/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/06/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/06/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/06/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 04/06/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/06/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/06/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/06/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/06/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/06/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/06/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/06/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/06/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/06/2006
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 04/06/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/06/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/06/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 04/06/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/06/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/06/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/06/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/06/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/06/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/06/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/06/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/06/2006
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/06/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/25/2006
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 04/25/2006
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 04/25/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/25/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/25/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/25/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/25/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/25/2006
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/25/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/25/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/25/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/25/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/25/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/25/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/25/2006
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/27/2006
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/27/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/27/2006
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/27/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/27/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/27/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/27/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 05/02/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/02/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/02/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/02/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/02/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/02/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/02/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/03/2006
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/03/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/03/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/03/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/03/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/03/2006
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 05/04/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/04/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/04/2006
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/04/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 05/04/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/04/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/09/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/09/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/09/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/09/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/09/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/09/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/09/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/09/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/09/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/09/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/09/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/09/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/09/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/09/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/09/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/09/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/09/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/09/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/09/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/09/2006
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/09/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/09/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/09/2006