Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 03/29/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/04/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/25/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/03/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/23/2006