Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/30/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/30/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/30/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/30/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/30/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/30/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/30/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/30/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/30/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/30/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/30/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/30/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/05/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/05/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/05/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/05/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/26/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/26/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/26/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/26/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/26/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/09/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/09/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/09/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/09/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/12/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/07/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/07/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/07/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/15/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/15/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/15/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/15/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/20/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/24/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/24/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/26/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 07/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/26/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/14/2006