Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/27/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/27/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/03/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/03/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/03/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/10/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/17/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/19/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/23/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/22/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/29/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/29/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/15/2006