Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 04/04/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/04/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 04/04/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 04/04/2006
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/04/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/04/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/04/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 04/04/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 04/04/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 04/04/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 04/04/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/25/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/25/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/25/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/03/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/03/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/03/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/03/2006
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/03/2006
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/03/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/03/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/03/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/03/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/03/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/03/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/03/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/13/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/13/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/13/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/20/2006
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/20/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/20/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/20/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/20/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/20/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/20/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/20/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/20/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/20/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/20/2006