Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 04/06/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/06/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/06/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/06/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/06/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/06/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/06/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/25/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/27/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/02/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/04/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/04/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/11/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/08/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/13/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/11/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/19/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/07/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 09/13/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/13/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/19/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/27/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/27/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/28/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/29/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/29/2006