Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 04/05/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/05/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/05/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/05/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/05/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/06/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/06/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/06/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/06/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/06/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/26/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/09/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/23/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/11/2006