Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/25/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/25/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/25/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/25/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/25/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/25/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/27/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/27/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/27/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/27/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/27/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/03/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/03/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/03/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/03/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/03/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/04/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/09/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/09/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/10/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/11/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/11/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/11/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/11/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/11/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/18/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/18/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 05/23/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/23/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/23/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/23/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/09/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/24/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/06/2006