Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/08/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/08/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 05/08/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/08/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/08/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/08/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/11/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/11/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/11/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/11/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/11/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/11/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/11/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/11/2006
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 05/11/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/11/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/11/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/11/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 05/11/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 05/17/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/17/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/17/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/17/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/17/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/17/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/17/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/17/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/17/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/17/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/17/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/17/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/19/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/19/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/19/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/19/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/19/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/19/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/19/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/19/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/23/2006
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/23/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/23/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/23/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/23/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 05/23/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/23/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/23/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/25/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/25/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/25/2006
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/25/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/06/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/06/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/06/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/06/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/08/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/08/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/08/2006
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/22/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/22/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/22/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/22/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/22/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/22/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/22/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/29/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/29/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/29/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/29/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/29/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/29/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/29/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/29/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/29/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/29/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/29/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/29/2006
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 06/29/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/29/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/29/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/29/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/29/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/29/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/13/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/13/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/13/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 07/13/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/13/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/20/2006