Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 04/06/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/25/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/25/2006
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/26/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/26/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/26/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/26/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/26/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/26/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/26/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/26/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/26/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/26/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/26/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 04/26/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/26/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/26/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/26/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/26/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/26/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/26/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 04/26/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/26/2006
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/27/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/27/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/27/2006
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 05/02/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/02/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/10/2006
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 05/10/2006
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/23/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/25/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/25/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/25/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/25/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/25/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/25/2006
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/25/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/25/2006