Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 04/06/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 04/25/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/25/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/25/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/25/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/02/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/02/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/02/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/03/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/03/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/09/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/09/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/10/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/10/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/10/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/10/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/10/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/10/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/10/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/17/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/17/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/17/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/22/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/22/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/22/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/24/2006
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/24/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/24/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/24/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/25/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/07/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/07/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/14/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/14/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/20/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/20/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/22/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/28/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/29/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/29/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/11/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/11/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/13/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 07/18/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 07/18/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/19/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/25/2006
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/25/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/25/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/27/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 07/28/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/28/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/14/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/21/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/28/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/29/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/06/2006