Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/06/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/27/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/03/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/10/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/16/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/19/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/23/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/07/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/07/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/09/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/27/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/28/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/12/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/17/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/19/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 07/20/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/20/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/26/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/27/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 08/02/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/06/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/06/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/06/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/07/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/07/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 09/12/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/13/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/13/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/13/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/13/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/14/2006
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 09/15/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/20/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/21/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 09/21/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/26/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/27/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/28/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/28/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/29/2006