Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/02/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/02/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 02/08/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/09/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/09/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/15/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/15/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/01/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/01/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/01/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/01/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/08/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/08/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/08/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/08/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/14/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/14/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/14/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/14/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/14/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/14/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/15/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/15/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/16/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/16/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/08/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/12/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/26/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/26/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/28/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/28/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 05/03/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/12/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 06/07/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/07/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/09/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/09/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/09/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/14/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/14/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 06/16/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/29/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/29/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/29/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/11/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/18/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/18/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/18/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/21/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/25/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 07/25/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/07/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/07/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/13/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/21/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/18/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/19/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/18/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 12/07/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/08/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/15/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/15/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/16/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/16/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 02/16/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 02/28/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 02/28/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/07/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/16/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/18/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/26/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/28/2006
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/12/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/12/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/12/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 11/14/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew