There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Reverse the Raid on Student Aid Act of 2006

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Higher Education Act of 1965 to reduce interest rates for student and parent borrowers.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/06/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
05/24/2006Referred to the Subcommittee on 21st Century Competitiveness.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
04/06/2006Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/06/2006Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (69)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/06/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/25/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/27/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/02/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 05/02/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/11/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/16/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/16/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/16/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/18/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/18/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/18/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/18/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/18/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/18/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/18/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/19/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/22/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/22/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/22/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/22/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/24/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/24/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/24/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/24/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/06/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/06/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/06/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/06/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/06/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/06/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/12/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/12/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/12/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/12/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/12/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/13/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/13/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/13/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/15/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/16/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/16/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/19/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/20/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/21/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/21/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/21/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/21/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/21/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/22/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/26/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/10/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/10/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/27/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/28/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/06/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/07/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/12/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/14/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/19/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 09/29/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/14/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/05/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Education and the Workforce04/06/2006 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on 21st Century Competitiveness05/24/2006 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5150. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/06/2006)

Reverse the Raid on Student Aid Act of 2006 - Amends the Higher Education Act of 1965 to cut student loan interest rates to 3.4% for student borrowers and 4.25% for parent borrowers under the Federal Family Education Loan (FFEL) and William D. Ford Direct Loan programs for loans whose first disbursement is made on or after July 1, 2006. Maintains the current 6.8% interest rate, however, for unsubsidized Stafford loans for middle-income borrowers under such programs.