Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/06/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 04/06/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 04/25/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/25/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/25/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/25/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/25/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 04/26/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/26/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/26/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/26/2006
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 04/27/2006
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/27/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/27/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/27/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 04/27/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/27/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/27/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/27/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/27/2006
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/27/2006
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/27/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/27/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/27/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/27/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/27/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/02/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/02/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/02/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/02/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/02/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/02/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/02/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/02/2006
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/02/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/02/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/09/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/09/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/09/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/09/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/09/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/09/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/10/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/10/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/10/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/10/2006
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/10/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/10/2006
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 05/10/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/10/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/10/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/10/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/10/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/10/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/10/2006
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 05/10/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/10/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/10/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/10/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/10/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/10/2006
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/10/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/10/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/10/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 05/10/2006
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/10/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/11/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/11/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/11/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/11/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/11/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/11/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/11/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/11/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/11/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/11/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/11/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/11/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/11/2006
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/11/2006
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/11/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/16/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/16/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/16/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/18/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/18/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/19/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/22/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/22/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/23/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/25/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/25/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/06/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/06/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/06/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/06/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/06/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/06/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/06/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/06/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/06/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/06/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 06/06/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/08/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/08/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/08/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/08/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/08/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/08/2006
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 06/08/2006
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/08/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/08/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/08/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/12/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/14/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/14/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/14/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/14/2006
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/15/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 06/20/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/21/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/12/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/17/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 07/24/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/29/2006