Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/02/2005
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-48]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/08/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/10/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/10/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 02/10/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/10/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/16/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/16/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/16/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 02/17/2005