Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 04/06/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/25/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/25/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/25/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/25/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 04/25/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/25/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/25/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/25/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/25/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/25/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/25/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/25/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/25/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/26/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/26/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 04/26/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/26/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/26/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/26/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/26/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/26/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/26/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/26/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/26/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/26/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/26/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/26/2006
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/26/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/26/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/26/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/26/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/26/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/26/2006
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/26/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/27/2006
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/27/2006
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/27/2006
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/02/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/02/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/02/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/02/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/02/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/02/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/02/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/02/2006
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/02/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/02/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/02/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/02/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/04/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/04/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/04/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/04/2006
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/04/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/04/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/04/2006
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/04/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/04/2006
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 05/04/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/04/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/04/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/04/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/04/2006
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/04/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/04/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/04/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/04/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/04/2006
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/04/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/04/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/04/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/04/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/04/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/09/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/09/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/09/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/09/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/09/2006
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/16/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/16/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/16/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/16/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/16/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 05/16/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 05/16/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/19/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/19/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/19/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/24/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/24/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/24/2006
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/24/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/09/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/27/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/10/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/19/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/19/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/20/2006
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/25/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/12/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/12/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/12/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/12/2006
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 09/12/2006