Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 04/06/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/19/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/19/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/19/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 05/19/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/19/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/19/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/19/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/19/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/19/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/19/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/19/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/22/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/18/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/28/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/28/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/07/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/07/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/07/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/29/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/29/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/29/2006