Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 02/09/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/09/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/09/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/09/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/09/2005
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 02/17/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 02/17/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/03/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/03/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/03/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/03/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/17/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/17/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/17/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/14/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 04/14/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/14/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/12/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/12/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/12/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/12/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/12/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 05/12/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/16/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 06/16/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/16/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/16/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/16/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/16/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/27/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/27/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/27/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/27/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/27/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/08/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/17/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 10/17/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/17/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/17/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/17/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/17/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 11/16/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/18/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 12/08/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 12/08/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/08/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 12/08/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 12/08/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 12/08/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 12/08/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/13/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 12/13/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 12/13/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/14/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/14/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 12/14/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 12/15/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/08/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/08/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/08/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/08/2006
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 02/16/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/07/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/07/2006
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/07/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/14/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/28/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/28/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/28/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/04/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/05/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/03/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/14/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/14/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/14/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/14/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/14/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/14/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/26/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/26/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/26/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/26/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/13/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/25/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/25/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/26/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/28/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/12/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/12/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/13/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 09/13/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/13/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/13/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/14/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/14/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/14/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/21/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/21/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/21/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/27/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/27/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/28/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/28/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/28/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/28/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/28/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/29/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/29/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/29/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 11/09/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/09/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/13/2006