Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 04/25/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/25/2006
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/09/2006
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/10/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/10/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/17/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/17/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/19/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/08/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/08/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/19/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/19/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 06/19/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/22/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/22/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/29/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/18/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/20/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/26/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/26/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/28/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/06/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/06/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/13/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/19/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/19/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/19/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 09/20/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/28/2006