Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/10/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/29/2006
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/29/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/29/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/29/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/11/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/25/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/07/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/07/2006