Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/25/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/27/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/27/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/27/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/27/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/27/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/27/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/27/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/27/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/04/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/04/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/04/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/04/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/04/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 05/04/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/04/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/04/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/04/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/04/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/04/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/04/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/17/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/17/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/17/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/17/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/17/2006
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/17/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/17/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/17/2006
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/17/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/17/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/17/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/17/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/18/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/18/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/18/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/18/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/19/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/24/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/24/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/24/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/24/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/24/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/24/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/24/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/24/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/24/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/24/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/24/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/24/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/24/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/24/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/24/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/24/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 05/24/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/24/2006
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/24/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 05/24/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/24/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/24/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/24/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/24/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/24/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/25/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/25/2006
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/25/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/25/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/25/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/25/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/25/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/25/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/25/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/07/2006
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/07/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/07/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/07/2006
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/07/2006
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/07/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/07/2006
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 06/07/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/08/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/08/2006
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/09/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/09/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/09/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/09/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/12/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/12/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/12/2006
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/12/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/14/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/14/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/14/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/14/2006
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/14/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/20/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/20/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/20/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/20/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/22/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/22/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/22/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/22/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/22/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/22/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/28/2006
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 06/28/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/28/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/28/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/28/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/28/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/10/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/10/2006
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 07/10/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/10/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/10/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/17/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/17/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 07/17/2006
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/17/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/17/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/27/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/27/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/07/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/07/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/07/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/07/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/07/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 09/07/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/07/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/07/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/07/2006
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 09/07/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/12/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/12/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/12/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 12/05/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/05/2006