Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/06/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/06/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/08/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/13/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/15/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/15/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/19/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/26/2006