There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Securing America's Energy Independence Act of 2006

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend the investment tax credit with respect to solar energy property and qualified fuel cell property, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/26/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
04/26/2006Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/26/2006Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (79)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/26/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/27/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/27/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/27/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/02/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/02/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/02/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 05/02/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/02/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/02/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/02/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/02/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/04/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/04/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/04/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/11/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/11/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/11/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/11/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/11/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/11/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/11/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/17/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/17/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/19/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/19/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/19/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/24/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 05/24/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/24/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/25/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/07/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/07/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/07/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/09/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/13/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/15/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/15/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/16/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/16/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/28/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/28/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/29/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 07/18/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 07/18/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/18/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/28/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/28/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/12/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/21/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 09/21/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/29/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/26/2006 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5206. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/26/2006)

Securing America's Energy Independence Act of 2006 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend through 2015: (1) the investment tax credit for solar energy property and qualified fuel cell property; and (2) the tax credit for residential photovoltaic, solar water heating, and fuel cell property expenditures. Modifies the maximum amounts for such residential credits based upon kilowatt of capacity.

Allows such credits to be taken against the alternative minimum tax.