Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 04/26/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/26/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 04/26/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/27/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/24/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/24/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 05/24/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/25/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/07/2006